Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/10/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/10/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/18/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/18/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/18/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/02/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/07/2006