Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/18/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/15/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/09/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/10/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/13/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/14/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew