Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/01/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/10/2006