Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/01/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/03/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2006