Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 11/01/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/07/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/14/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/13/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/13/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/29/2006