Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/01/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/01/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/07/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/07/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/02/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/04/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/19/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/06/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/14/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/13/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/14/2006