Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/14/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/14/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/07/2005