Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/02/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/08/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2005