Committees: H.R.4200 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources11/02/2005 Referred to
03/29/2006 Markup by
05/04/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-451
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health11/02/2005 Referred to
11/10/2005 Hearings by
03/29/2006 Discharged from
House Agriculture11/02/2005 Referred to
12/07/2005 Hearings by
04/05/2006 Markup by
05/04/2006 Discharged from
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Dairy, Nutrition, and Forestry11/08/2005 Referred to
04/05/2006 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure11/02/2005 Referred to
05/04/2006 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management11/03/2005 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment11/03/2005 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/18/2006 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry Subcommittee on Forestry, Conservation, and Rural Revitalization08/02/2006 Hearings by