Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/12/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/27/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/19/2006