Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 11/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/07/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 11/17/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/22/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/22/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/07/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/30/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew