Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/03/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 11/03/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/03/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/07/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/01/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/01/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/02/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew