Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/09/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/09/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/09/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/09/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/09/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/10/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/10/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/10/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/10/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/10/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/10/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 11/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Sekula Gibbs, Shelley [R-TX-22] 12/06/2006