There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 8135 Forest Lane in Dallas, Texas, as the "Dr. Robert E. Price Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-398. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006Presented to President.
12/06/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11376)
12/19/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12212)
12/19/2005Committee on Government Reform discharged.
11/07/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/18/2006Became Public Law No: 109-398. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006HousePresented to President.
12/06/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11376)
07/27/2006SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/27/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
12/19/2005SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/19/2005-12:52amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/19/2005-12:52amHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H12212)
12/19/2005-12:51amHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12212)
12/19/2005-12:51amHouseMr. Issa asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
12/19/2005HouseCommittee on Government Reform discharged.
11/07/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
11/07/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (29)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform11/07/2005 Referred to
12/19/2005 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/27/2006 Referred to
07/27/2006 Markup by
12/06/2006 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4246.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4246. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-398 (12/18/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 8135 Forest Lane in Dallas, Texas, as the "Dr. Robert E. Price Post Office Building."