Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/02/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/27/2005