Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 11/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 11/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/10/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/06/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/31/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/19/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/22/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/13/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/13/2006