Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/10/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/17/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/18/2005