Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/10/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/10/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/10/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 11/10/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 11/10/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/16/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/20/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2006