Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/14/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/19/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/28/2006