Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/08/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/13/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/16/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/17/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/31/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/31/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/01/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/15/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/27/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/27/2006