Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/15/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/18/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/18/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/18/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22] 11/18/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/15/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 12/15/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/15/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/16/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 12/16/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/16/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/18/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/18/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/18/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 12/18/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 12/18/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/01/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/16/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/06/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/25/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/15/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew