Summary: H.R.4337 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (11/16/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Gulf Opportunity Zone Public Finance Relief Act of 2005 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow a tax credit for investment in Gulf tax credit bonds. Defines a"Gulf tax credit bond" as any bond: (1) that is issued by Alabama, Louisiana, or Mississippi after December 31, 2005, and before January 1, 2007; (2) 95 percent of the proceeds of which are used to refinance existing bonds or make loans to localities for such refinancing; and (3) the maturity of which does not exceed two years. Requires states issuing Gulf tax credit bonds to pledge matching amounts equal to the face amount of such bonds.

Limits the amount of eligible Gulf tax credit bonds to $200 billion for Louisiana, $100 billion for Mississippi, and $50 billion for Alabama.

Allows for one additional advance refunding of outstanding bond obligations of Alabama, Louisiana, or Mississippi until December 31, 2010. Limits the amount of bonds eligible for an advance refunding to $4.5 billion for Louisiana, $2.25 billion for Mississippi, and $1.125 billion for Alabama.

Provides for federal guarantees of up to $3 billion of the bonds issued by Alabama, Louisiana, or Mississippi before January 1, 2008, for the purpose of restoring lost revenue and funding infrastructure in areas affected by Hurricane Katrina. Limits such guarantee to 50% of bond principal.