Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/18/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/01/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/07/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/08/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/14/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/15/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/29/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/05/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/05/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/05/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/05/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/26/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/27/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/09/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/09/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/23/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/23/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/13/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/19/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/13/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/13/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew