Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 11/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/06/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/07/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/07/2006