Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 11/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/08/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/14/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/27/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/19/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/28/2006