Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/10/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/10/2006