Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/16/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/10/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/17/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/23/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/07/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/19/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006