Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/29/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/10/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/06/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/13/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/10/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/05/2006