Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/02/2006