Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/06/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/14/2006