Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 11/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/31/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/11/2006