There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize permanently the use of penalty and franked mail in efforts relating to the location and recovery of missing children.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-426. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006Presented to President.
12/07/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/07/2006Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11548)
06/26/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4532)
11/18/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2006Became Public Law No: 109-426. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2006Signed by President.
12/11/2006HousePresented to President.
12/07/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/07/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/07/2006SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11548)
06/27/2006SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/26/2006-6:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/26/2006-6:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4532)
06/26/2006-6:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4416.
06/26/2006-6:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4532-4533)
06/26/2006-6:48pmHouseMs. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/08/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
06/08/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
11/18/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2005HouseReferred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/18/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/13/2005
Del. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2006
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/06/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/06/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/06/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/09/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/26/2006

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Government Reform11/18/2005 Referred to
06/08/2006 Markup by
Committee on House Administration11/18/2005 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/27/2006 Referred to
12/07/2006 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.4416.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4416. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-426 (12/20/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Makes permanent the authority to use official (penalty and franked) mail in efforts relating to the location and recovery of missing children.