Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/29/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/06/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/06/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/06/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/06/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/09/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/26/2006