Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-140 (12/22/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 14, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

(Sec. 1) Authorizes the Secretary of State to provide for U.S. participation in the Regional Emerging Diseases Intervention Center ("REDI Center") in Singapore.

Requires the Secretary to: (1) consult with the Committee on International Relations of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Foreign Relations of the Senate (Committees); and (2) report on REDI Center efforts respecting bioterrorism concerns.

(Sec. 2) Amends the Foreign Service Act of 1980 to credit Department of State medical reimbursements to the currently available appropriation account, which shall be available for expenditure during the fiscal year received or longer as may be provided by law.

(Sec. 3) Amends the Diplomatic Security Act to authorize the Secretary to not convene an Accountability Review Board to conduct an inquiry for incidents that involve serious injury, loss of life, or significant property destruction at a U.S. mission in Iraq or Afghanistan during the period of October 1, 2005, through September 30, 2009.

Requires the Secretary, in the case of such an incident, to: (1) notify the Committees; and (2) investigate the incident and submit a report to such Committees.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Foreign Operations, Export Financing, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2004 to repeal the provision making United States Agency for International Development (USAID) post differential and danger pay increases for employees not in Iraq or Afghanistan subject to the provision of similar pay allowances for Department employees.

Increases the maximum post-differential and danger pay allowance for a Foreign Service employee to 35% of base pay.

Directs the Secretary to report to the Committees and to the Committee on Government Reform of the House and the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs of the Senate respecting such increases' effect on "hard-to-fill" positions.

(Sec. 5) Amends the Foreign Service Act of 1980 to authorize the Foreign Service Grievance Board to retain an employee on the payroll while a grievance is being reviewed.

(Sec. 6) Amends the Foreign Relations Authorization Act, Fiscal Year 2003 to extend the International Broadcasting Bureau personal services contracting pilot program through December 31, 2006.

(Sec. 7) Authorizes the Department to provide in advance funds available for official residence expenses to those persons currently eligible to receive such reimbursement.

(Sec. 8) Amends the United States International Broadcasting Act of 1994 to authorize the Broadcasting Board of Governors to pay the primary and secondary education costs of dependents of personnel stationed in the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, including certain transportation costs, if the Board determines that the schools available in the Commonwealth are unable to provide an adequate education. Limits such payments to amounts similarly permitted to Department of Defense (DOD) dependents' educational expenses in the Commonwealth.