Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/08/2005