Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/08/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/16/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/31/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/31/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/31/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/15/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/15/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/15/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/30/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/03/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/17/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/20/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/02/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/21/2006