Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/07/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/16/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/16/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/14/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/16/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2006