Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/13/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/13/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/08/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/14/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/08/2006