Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/15/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/31/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/14/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/16/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/25/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/26/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/27/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/03/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2006