Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 12/08/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/01/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2006