Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 12/08/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/14/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/19/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/21/2006