Summary: H.R.4501 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-167 (01/10/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on December 18, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Passport Services Enhancement Act of 2005 - Amends the Passport Act of June 4, 1920 to authorize the Secretary of State to establish and collect an additional passport application surcharge in order to cover the costs of meeting the increased passport demand resulting from specified compliance actions under the Intelligence Reform and Terrorism Prevention Act of 2004.

States that: (1) such surcharge shall be deposited as an offsetting collection to the appropriate Department of State appropriation for the purpose of meeting such costs; and (2) such authority may not be exercised after September 30, 2010.

Directs the Secretary to ensure that the total cost of a passport application during FY2006-FY2007, including such surcharge, shall not exceed the cost of a passport application as of December 1, 2005.