Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/01/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/30/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/20/2006