Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 12/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/28/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/01/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/26/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/20/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/25/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/26/2006