Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/15/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/16/2006