Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/18/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 01/31/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/08/2006