Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/07/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/14/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/14/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/15/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/06/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/13/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/28/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/08/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/08/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 05/16/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/12/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/15/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/20/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/27/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/28/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/19/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/19/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/20/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/27/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/14/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/21/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/27/2006