Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/01/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/01/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/23/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/07/2005