Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/15/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/11/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/11/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 05/19/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/19/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/19/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/19/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2006