Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/02/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2006